MD SB109 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Veto sustained (0-44)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Veto sustained (0-44)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that specified prohibitions on participation in procurement apply only for a specified period of time following the issuance of an invitation for bids or a request for proposals; providing that specified prohibitions on participation in procurement do not apply to a subsequent invitation for bids or request for proposals for which the specifications are reused under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Procurement - Prohibitions on Participation
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-12 | Senate | Veto sustained (0-44) |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-03-24 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-24 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-24 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-17 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Community Facilities and Services
Contracts
Education
Health
Procurement
Social Services
Solicitation
State Government - Procurement
Time
Zoning and Planning
Community Facilities and Services
Contracts
Education
Health
Procurement
Social Services
Solicitation
State Government - Procurement
Time
Zoning and Planning