MD SB1080 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain recipients of State funds to install an assistive listening system in an assembly area during construction or renovation of the assembly area under certain circumstances; requiring the Department of General Services to establish a certain waiver process and a certain penalty process relating to the requirement to install an assistive listening system in an assembly area during construction or renovation of the assembly area; authorizing the Department to adopt certain regulations; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assistive Listening System Requirement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06SenateUnfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
2018-03-02SenateHearing canceled
2018-03-13SenateHearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-15SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-02-12SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback