MD SB1069 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 495
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 495
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a 5% tolerance from the gross vehicle weight limits for certain vehicles used in certain agricultural activities during harvest time under certain circumstances; and limiting the distance within which a certain vehicle operating under a certain tolerance from a certain gross vehicle weight limit may travel.
Title
Motor Vehicles - Gross Vehicle Weight - Agricultural Products
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Mathias [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 495 |
2017-12-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2018-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2018-02-08 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Agriculture
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Weights and Measures
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Weights and Measures