MD SB1063 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 600
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting referral of a patient to a certifying provider by certain persons or entities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Certifying Providers - Referrals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-2) (Y: 131 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 600
2018-04-09SenateReturned Passed
2018-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (130-2)
2018-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-06HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-06HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-04-03HouseHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-28HouseRereferred to Health and Government Operations
2018-03-26HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2018-03-23SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2018-03-22SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-22SenateFavorable with Amendments {887774/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-22SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-03-20SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-28SenateHearing canceled
2018-03-22SenateHearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-12SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-02-06SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback