MD SB1057 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering provisions of law that apply to nursing staff agencies and nursing personnel to apply more broadly to health care staff agencies and specified health care practitioners licensed or certified by health occupation boards; requiring a health care staff agency to be licensed by the Office of Health Care Quality in the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene before referring specified health care practitioners to a health care facility to render temporary health care services at a health care facility in the State; etc.
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Care Staff Agencies - Regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 340 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-0) |
2013-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {236984/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2013-04-04 | House | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-26 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {307073/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred Senate Rules |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Middleton) Adopted |
2013-03-07 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Licenses
Nurses
Physicians
Work, Labor and Employment
Health Occupations
Licenses
Nurses
Physicians
Work, Labor and Employment