MD SB105 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-28 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-28 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of a "person in a position of authority" relating to prohibiting an individual from engaging in a sexual act, sexual contact, or vaginal intercourse with a minor under specified circumstances; prohibiting a person from engaging in a sexual act, sexual contact, or vaginal intercourse with a minor under specified circumstances; and providing that a specified violation under the Act is not included within a specified definition for a specified registry.
Title
Criminal Law - Sexual Contact with Minors - School Employees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable with Amendments Adopted (39-6) (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable with Amendments Adopted (39-6) (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (39-6) |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {988370/3 |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator King) Adopted |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {988370/3 |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Counselors
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Minors
Private Schools
Public Schools
Registration
Sexual Offenses
Students
Teachers
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Minors
Private Schools
Public Schools
Registration
Sexual Offenses
Students
Teachers