MD SB1049 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-04 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting, in making a decision on an application for a license or permit to construct a pier, the Department of the Environment from considering any vessel owned by the applicant as a condition for issuing the license or permit.
Title
Environment - Tidal Wetlands - Construction of Piers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
HB931 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-26 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 16 | 105.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |