MD SB1048 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 19
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Redesignating electronic voter registration agencies as automatic voter registration agencies; requiring automatic voter registration agencies to inform an applicant completing an applicable transaction that the applicant shall be registered to vote or shall have a voter registration record updated unless the applicant declines these services or is not eligible to register to vote; requiring automatic voter registration agencies to implement automatic voter registration by July 1, 2019; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Secure and Accessible Registration Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (93-46) (Y: 94 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (31-13) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {823027/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (15-31) (Y: 16 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 19
2018-04-07SenateReturned Passed
2018-03-28HouseThird Reading Passed (93-46)
2018-03-28HouseMotion vote previous question (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted
2018-03-27HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-27HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-26HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2018-03-23HouseHearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-22HouseHearing canceled
2018-03-27HouseHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-16HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2018-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (31-13)
2018-03-14SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-14SenateFloor Amendment {823027/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (15-31)
2018-03-14SenateFloor Amendment {433023/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
2018-03-14SenateFavorable with Amendments {884232/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-13SenateLaid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
2018-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments {884232/1
2018-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-01SenateHearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb1048&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb1048f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb1048t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_19_sb1048t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0008/sb1048_88423201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0008/sb1048_43302301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0008/sb1048_82302701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0008/sb1048.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb1048_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0530.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0583.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb1048_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0911.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback