MD SB1042 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB162
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the conditions under which a lawsuit is considered a strategic lawsuit against public participation (SLAPP suit); specifying the conditions under which a lawsuit is not considered a SLAPP suit; altering the conditions under which a defendant in a SLAPP suit is not civilly liable for certain communications; providing for a plaintiff's burden and the award of certain fees in connection with a motion to dismiss; providing for the prospective application of the Act; etc.
Title
Civil Actions – Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-19 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
SB1042 (Carry Over) 2020-03-04 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
HB379 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
HB379 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Appeals
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Commerce and Business
Court Costs
Human Rights
Insurance
Petitions
Securities
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Commerce and Business
Court Costs
Human Rights
Insurance
Petitions
Securities
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 12 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 5 | 807 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB1042?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb1042f.pdf |