MD SB1040 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing in Frederick County the creation of a Middletown Wine Festival license; authorizing the Frederick County Board of License Commissioners to issue the license to a holder of specified licenses; specifying that the license entitles the holder to display and sell at retail wine for consumption on or off the premises on the days and for the hours designated for the Middletown Wine Festival; providing for a license fee; authorizing the Burgess and Commissioners of Middletown to hold not more than two 1-day Middletown Wine Festivals; etc.
Title
Frederick County - Middletown Wine Festival License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2012-03-29 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-03 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-03-24 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2012-03-30 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-20 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-20 | Favorable with Amendments 124637/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-12 | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-07 | Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-23 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Fees
Frederick County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Municipal Corporations
Rules and Regulations
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Fees
Frederick County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Municipal Corporations
Rules and Regulations