MD SB1039 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to establish reimbursement levels, rather than maximum reimbursement levels, for certain drug products; requiring that certain minimum reimbursement levels be at least equal to the National Average Drug Acquisition Cost of the generic product plus a certain fee-for-service professional dispensing fee; providing that certain provisions of the Act apply to managed care organizations that use pharmacy benefits managers to manage prescription drug coverage; etc.
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Managed Care Organizations That Use Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Reimbursement Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-03-04 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Data
Drugs
Fees
Health
Health Insurance
Health, Department of
Industry and Technology
Insurance - Health
Investigations and Inquiries
Managed Care Organizations
Medical Assistance
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Prices
Reimbursement Rates
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Data
Drugs
Fees
Health
Health Insurance
Health, Department of
Industry and Technology
Insurance - Health
Investigations and Inquiries
Managed Care Organizations
Medical Assistance
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Prices
Reimbursement Rates