MD SB1028 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 645
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 645
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution authorizing the General Assembly to increase or add Executive Department items in the budget bill, provided that the total of the appropriation for the Executive Department approved by the General Assembly does not exceed the total proposed appropriation for the Executive Department submitted by the Governor; submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State at the next general election to be held in November 2020 for adoption or rejection; etc.
Title
Balancing the State Budget
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] | Sen. Sarah Elfreth [D] | Sen. Melony Griffith [D] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
Sen. Nancy King [D] | Sen. Douglas Peters [D] | Sen. Craig Zucker [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 97 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Floor Amendment 403426/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (Y: 40 N: 95 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2020-03-18 - House - Floor Amendment 763328/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (Y: 38 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 97 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - Floor Amendment 403426/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (Y: 40 N: 95 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2020-03-18 - House - Floor Amendment 763328/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (Y: 38 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 645 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (95-39) |
2020-03-18 | House | Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Gilchrist) Adopted |
2020-03-18 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (97-38) |
2020-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Floor Amendment {403426/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Rejected (40-95) |
2020-03-18 | House | Floor Amendment {763328/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (38-97) |
2020-03-18 | House | Motion Laid Over (Delegate Kipke) Withdrawn |
2020-03-18 | House | Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted |
2020-03-18 | House | Motion Laid Over (Delegate Kipke) |
2020-03-18 | House | Floor Amendment {763328/1 (Delegate Kipke) |
2020-03-18 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-18 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2020-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/18 at 9:30 a.m. |
2020-03-17 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (30-15) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Floor Amendment {319238/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {289032/1 Adopted |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {289032/1 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
II - Executive Department | 17 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
III - Legislative Department | 14 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
III - Legislative Department | 52 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |