MD SB1027 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-08 - Third Reading Passed (101-34)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-08 - Third Reading Passed (101-34)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Defining "taxpayer" for purposes of certain provisions of law concerning property tax appeals to mean a person with an ownership interest or a leasehold interest in a property that is subject to an appeal; and applying the Act retroactively to affect any petition for review of an assessment of property filed after December 1, 2022.
Title
Property Tax - Appeals - Definition of "Taxpayer"
Sponsors
Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 101 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (101-34) |
2024-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {473129/1 Adopted |
2024-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2024-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-16 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Floor Amendment {643129/1 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Guzzone) Adopted |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {863728/1 Adopted |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1488 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-13 - Hearing 3/13 at 2:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 14 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 14 | 502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 14 | 509 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 14 | 512 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |