MD SB1022 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore to establish by ordinance a Community Benefits District in the East Baltimore section to be a special tax district and provide specified services; authorizing the Mayor and City Council to establish a Community Benefits District Authority to provide specified services; requiring a specified ordinance to include specified provisions; requiring the Authority to establish a specified financial plan for the District under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Baltimore City Charter - Community Benefits District - East Baltimore
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-08 | Third Reading Passed (137-1) | |
2010-04-08 | Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Davis) Adopted (136-2) | |
2010-04-08 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-12 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-04-12 | Re-referred Economic Matters | |
2010-04-06 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2010-04-10 | Returned Passed | |
2010-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (43-1) | |
2010-04-06 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-10 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-09 | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-05 | Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-24 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Exemptions
Fees
Hearings
Laws and Ordinances
Liability
Minorities
Notices
Procurement
Revenue and Taxes
Special Tax Districts
Tax Credits
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Exemptions
Fees
Hearings
Laws and Ordinances
Liability
Minorities
Notices
Procurement
Revenue and Taxes
Special Tax Districts
Tax Credits