MD SB1021 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Elections or a local board of elections that adopts a change in an administrative policy affecting voting rights to provide specified public notice of the change; providing for the form, content, and timing of the public notice; providing that an individual's right to vote may not be denied or abridged because the individual failed to comply with a change in an administrative policy affecting voting rights if the State Board or local board did not provide public notice of the change; etc.
Title
Election Law - Change in Administrative Policy Affecting Voting Rights - Notice and Judicial Review
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-18 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-17 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Appeals
Attorney General
Circuit Courts
Court of Appeals
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Government
Evidence
Judicial Review
Notices
Public Information
Registration
Voting
Attorney General
Circuit Courts
Court of Appeals
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Government
Evidence
Judicial Review
Notices
Public Information
Registration
Voting