MD SB102 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-25 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-25 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a law enforcement officer from removing or participating in the removal of a passenger from an aircraft under certain circumstances.
Title
Airplane Passenger Public Safety Act of 2018
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-25 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-04-14 | Senate | Pre-filed |