MD SB102 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing specified provisions of law that relate to joint fences for adjoining farms in St. Mary's County.
Title
St. Mary's County - Farm Fences - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2017-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-04-05 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-02 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |