MD SB102 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified accumulated contributions of nonvested former members to be transferred into a specified fund; providing that specified accumulated contributions shall be paid to specified former members under specified circumstances; requiring specified transferred accumulated contributions to be paid to specified nonvested former members from a specified fund under specified circumstances; making conforming changes; etc.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Accumulated Contributions of Nonvested Former Members
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2015-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-31 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2015-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-27 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {629332/1 Report Adopted |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 9:00 a.m. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |