MD SB1017 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 164
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 164
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the termination date to June 30, 2019, for the Workgroup to Study Safe Harbor Policy for Youth Victims of Human Trafficking; requiring the Workgroup to submit specified reports to the Governor and the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Workgroup to Study Safe Harbor Policy for Youth Victims of Human Trafficking - Sunset Extension
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 164 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2017-04-05 | House | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2017-03-27 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {498371/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Governor
Human Rights
Interstate Affairs
Reports
Safety
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Victims
Crimes and Punishments
Governor
Human Rights
Interstate Affairs
Reports
Safety
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Victims