MD SB1016 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-08 - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a private lender to provide capital for a loan provided under a local Clean Energy Loan Program; providing that, with the consent of any holder of a mortgage or deed of trust on the property, a county or municipality may collect loan payments owed on a commercial loan to a private lender or to a county or municipality through a surcharge on a property owner's property tax bill; providing that an unpaid surcharge constitutes a lien against the property on which it is imposed under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Clean Energy Loan Programs - Private Lenders - Collection of Loan Payments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2013-04-06 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Garagiola) {587070/1 Adopted |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {777978/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 11:00 a.m. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Alternative Energy Sources
Bonds
Commerce and Business
Counties
Deeds
Energy Matters
Fees
Financial Institutions
Liens
Loans
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Real Property
Taxes - Property
Bonds
Commerce and Business
Counties
Deeds
Energy Matters
Fees
Financial Institutions
Liens
Loans
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Real Property
Taxes - Property