MD SB1012 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Veto sustained (0-44)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Veto sustained (0-44)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Baltimore City Public School Board Community Panel to select nominees to be recommended to the Mayor as qualified candidates for appointment to the Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners; repealing the role of the Governor in jointly making appointments to, filling specified vacancies on, and jointly removing members from the Board; requiring the Mayor to appoint specified members of the Board and fill specified vacancies from a list of qualified individuals submitted by a specified panel; etc.
Title
Baltimore City Board of School Commissioners - Members - Appointment and Removal
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (117-23) (Y: 117 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (117-23) (Y: 117 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-12 | Senate | Veto sustained (0-44) |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2017-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (117-23) |
2017-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {105765/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-16 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {994532/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Committees and Commissions
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Governor
Public Officials
Committees and Commissions
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Governor
Public Officials