MD SB101 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB837
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from using telephone facilities, data files, or equipment to make calls or send data intended to annoy, abuse, torment, or harass a public safety answering point or public safety agency; prohibiting a person from using telephone facilities, data files, or equipment to make calls or send data to a public safety answering point or a public safety agency with the intent to trigger an emergency response or impair certain functions; establishing certain penalties; etc.
Title
Criminal Law - Public Safety - Interference With Agencies and Services - Prohibitions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | Hearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2020-08-04 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB837 (Carry Over) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 3/03 at 12:00 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Data
Emergency Services
Injury
Law Enforcement
Penalties and Sentences
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Data
Emergency Services
Injury
Law Enforcement
Penalties and Sentences
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 3 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 3 | 804 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 3 | 804.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 7 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 9 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0101?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0101f.pdf |