MD SB101 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 143
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that the use of a firearm in the commission of a certain felony or other crime of violence constitutes a crime of violence; altering the circumstances under which sexual abuse of a minor is a crime of violence; eliminating parole eligibility for certain violent offenders; adding to a list of convictions that may be expunged under certain circumstances; providing that a petition for expungement may not be filed earlier than 15 years after the person satisfies the sentences for all convictions for which expungement is requested; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law – Crimes of Violence, Expungement, and Drug Treatment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (38-7) (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (107-31) (Y: 108 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 143
2018-04-09SenatePassed Enrolled
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (38-7)
2018-04-09SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2018-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (107-31)
2018-04-07HouseFloor Amendment {253720/1 (Delegate Angel) Rejected
2018-04-07HouseSpecial Order until later this session (Delegate Angel) Adopted
2018-04-07HouseFloor Amendment {743924/1 (Delegate M. Washington) Rejected
2018-04-07HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-07HouseFloor Committee Amendment {752117/1 Adopted
2018-04-07HouseFavorable with Amendments {492812/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-07HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2018-03-21HouseHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2018-02-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-02-06SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-06SenateFavorable with Amendments {338771/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-01-17SenateHearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-10SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2017-11-15SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0101&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0101f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0101t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/sb/sb0101e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_143_sb0101e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0101_33877101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0101_25372001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0101_49281201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0101_74392401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0101_75211701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0001/sb0101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0101_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0179.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/sb0101_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1368.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1326.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback