MD SB101 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 47
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 47
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing provisions of law that relate to the licensing and operation of specified amusement devices in St. Mary's County.
Title
St. Mary's County - Licensing and Operation of Amusement Devices - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 47 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-03-30 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-30 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2017-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-14 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m. |
2017-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Counties - Local Laws
Fairs
Gaming
Licenses
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Local Laws
Revenue and Taxes
St. Mary's County
Fairs
Gaming
Licenses
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Local Laws
Revenue and Taxes
St. Mary's County