MD SB100 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 27
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 27
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Insurance Commissioner, when reviewing specified administrative expenses submitted by an authorized insurer that are associated with late payments, to include in the review the cost incurred by an authorized insurer or a vendor of the authorized insurer to accept late payments or installment payments by credit card, debit card, electronic funds transfer, or electronic check payment.
Title
Insurance - Premiums and Charges - Review of Administrative Expenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 27 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2014-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-27 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2014-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-24 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Floor Committee Amendment (Finance) {907979/1 Adopted |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Funds Transfer
Fees
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Electronic Funds Transfer
Fees
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration