MD SB10 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to require an individual appointed by the Governor to fill a vacancy in the office of Delegate or Senator in the General Assembly to serve for the remainder of the term if the vacancy occurs after a certain date; requiring that a special election be held at the same time as a certain regular statewide election to fill a vacancy in the office of Delegate or Senator in the General Assembly if the vacancy occurs on or before a certain date; etc.
Title
General Assembly – Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in Office
Sponsors
Sen. Clarence Lam [D] | Sen. Michael Hough [R] | Sen. Sarah Elfreth [D] | Sen. Katie Hester [D] |
Sen. Cory McCray [D] | Sen. Justin Ready [R] | Sen. Charles Sydnor [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-25 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Floor Amendment {193425/1 (Senator Lam) Adopted |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 1/28 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB103 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-15 - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Constitutional Amendments
County Councils
County Executives
Elections
General Assembly
Governor
Referendum
State Government - General Assembly
County Councils
County Executives
Elections
General Assembly
Governor
Referendum
State Government - General Assembly
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
XVII - Quadrennial Elections | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
III - Legislative Department | 13 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |