MD HJ8 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 6
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 6
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Stating that the State of Maryland stands in solidarity with the government and people of Ukraine as they resist the unprovoked invasion of their territory by the Russian Federation.
Title
Solidarity With the Government and People of Ukraine
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 6 |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Benson) Adopted |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Senate Rules |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2022-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (125-0) |
2022-03-11 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-11 | House | Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2022-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 8:30 a.m. |
2022-03-01 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Same As/Similar To
SJ11 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-12 - Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 7