MD HJ2 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-13 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-13 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Urging the U.S. Congress to propose an amendment to the U.S. Constitution that affirms every citizen's individual right to vote, reserves inalienable political rights to natural persons, and authorizes regulation of campaign contributions and electioneering expenditures.
Title
United States Constitution - Democracy Amendment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (89-50) (Y: 89 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (89-50) |
2015-04-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {983426/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2015-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-05 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Campaign Financing
Congress, U.S.
Constitution, U.S.
Constitutional Amendments
Conventions
Elections
Interstate Affairs
Secretary of State
Voting
Congress, U.S.
Constitution, U.S.
Constitutional Amendments
Conventions
Elections
Interstate Affairs
Secretary of State
Voting