MD HJ2 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Rescinding Maryland's ratification of the Corwin Amendment to the United States Constitution.
Title
Rescission of Maryland's Ratification of the Corwin Amendment to the United States Constitution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2014-04-07 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2014-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2014-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {963523/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-02-24 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-09 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Congress, U.S.
Constitution, U.S.
Federal Government
Governor
Human Rights
Private Sector Labor and Industry
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - General Assembly
Constitution, U.S.
Federal Government
Governor
Human Rights
Private Sector Labor and Industry
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
State Government - General Assembly