MD HJ1 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-11 - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Demanding that the federal government halt its practice of assuming powers and imposing mandates on the states of the United States for purposes not enumerated under the Constitution of the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Sovereignty Under the Tenth Amendment to the Constitution of the

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-11 Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
2011-03-09 Hearing 3/21 at 2:00 p.m.
2011-01-12 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2010-11-17 Pre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback