MD HB995 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 589
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 589
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the hours for sale of specified alcoholic beverages on Sundays by a holder of a Class D beer license, a Class D beer and light wine license, a Class B beer, wine, and liquor license, and a Class D beer, wine, and liquor license in Allegany County under specified circumstances.
Title
Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 589 |
2016-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2016-04-07 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {804733/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2016-03-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {293197/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2016-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Allegany County
Blue Laws
Elections
Referendum
Retail Sales
Voting
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Allegany County
Blue Laws
Elections
Referendum
Retail Sales
Voting