MD HB995 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-13 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-13 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting, with a specified exception, a person from applying a lawn care pesticide on the grounds of specified child care centers, schools, and recreation centers and on specified other recreational fields; authorizing a person to apply a lawn care pesticide in accordance with specified provisions of law if a specified person determines that an emergency application is necessary to eliminate an immediate threat to human health; requiring specified notice and recordkeeping; etc.
Title
Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care Centers, Schools, and Recreation Facilities - Prohibition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-19 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-04 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Child Care
Children
Community Facilities and Services
Emergencies
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Notices
Pest Control
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Records
Rules and Regulations
Sports and Recreation
Agriculture, Department of
Child Care
Children
Community Facilities and Services
Emergencies
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Notices
Pest Control
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Records
Rules and Regulations
Sports and Recreation