MD HB995 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Distinguishing between public, private nonprofit, and for-profit institutions of higher education; prohibiting a person from engaging in unfair or deceptive practices in the offer for sale of specified educational services; authorizing the Maryland Higher Education Commission to create and provide for the operation of a specified guaranty fund; prohibiting institutions of higher education from paying a commission, bonus, or other incentive payment based on success in student recruitment or admission activity; etc.
Title
Higher Education - Regulation of Public, Private Nonprofit, and For-Profit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-08 | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations Withdrawn | |
2011-03-28 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-03-23 | Hearing 3/29 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-08 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-02-23 | Hearing 3/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-11 | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Fees
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Licenses
Nonprofit Organizations
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Aid
Students
Unfair Trade Practices
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Licenses
Nonprofit Organizations
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Aid
Students
Unfair Trade Practices
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2011rs/billfile/HB0995.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2011rs/bills/hb/hb0995f.pdf |