MD HB994 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-03 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a certain exemption from certain insurance laws for certain voluntary noncontractual religious publication arrangements; exempting from certain insurance laws certain health care sharing ministries; requiring a person to obtain a certificate of registration from the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to act as a health care sharing ministry in the State; requiring the Commissioner to send a notice of an impending expiration of a certificate of registration not later than 30 days before the expiration; etc.
Title
Insurance - Health Care Sharing Ministries
Sponsors
Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R] | Del. Talmadge Branch [D] | Del. Jason Buckel [R] | Del. Kevin Hornberger [R] |
Del. Emily Shetty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2020-02-18 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB697 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-27 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Auditors and Audits
Certifications
Communications
Demographics
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Ethics
Fees
Fines
Forms
Health
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Insurance - Health
Insurance Administration
internet
Laws and Ordinances
Medical Treatments
Names
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Public Information
Publications
Records
Registration
Religion
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Auditors and Audits
Certifications
Communications
Demographics
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Ethics
Fees
Fines
Forms
Health
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Insurance - Health
Insurance Administration
internet
Laws and Ordinances
Medical Treatments
Names
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Public Information
Publications
Records
Registration
Religion
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Insurance | 1 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 27 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 8 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 8 | 702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 8 | 703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 8 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 8 | 705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 8 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 8 | 707 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |