MD HB994 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to apply to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for a State plan amendment to the Family Planning Program; altering from 6 to 12 months the time period for a single dispensing of a supply of prescription contraceptives under certain Programs; requiring, by October 1, 2020, the Department, along with the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange, to establish a presumptive eligibility process and integrate a certain process for the Family Planning Program into the Maryland Health Connection; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Family Planning Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 464
2018-04-04HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-02SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-02SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2018-03-29SenateHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {516988/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-03-06HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-16HouseHearing canceled
2018-03-09HouseHearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback