MD HB994 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person to install a maximum of six personal watercraft lifts or hoists per pier, a maximum of four boat lifts or hoists per pier, or a combination of a maximum of six boat or personal watercraft lifts or hoists per pier of which not more than four lifts or hoists are boat lifts or hoists, under a minor wetlands and waterways project authorization from the Department of the Environment; and establishing a $300 application fee for an authorization to install the lifts or hoists.
Title
Environment - Wetlands and Waterways Authorizations - Installation of Personal Watercraft Lifts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276 |
2013-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-22 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2013-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {370914/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |