MD HB993 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 769
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that, consistent with certain fiduciary duties, the investment policy manual adopted by the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System include certain policies and address certain details regarding the management of certain risks in the investment of State Retirement and Pension System assets; requiring the Board of Trustees to submit a report on its risk assessment of the investments of the several systems by January 31, 2019, and every year thereafter; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Pension Risk Mitigation Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (92-44) (Y: 93 N: 45 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (90-48) (Y: 91 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {893829/1 (Delegate Fisher) Rejected (50-83) (Y: 51 N: 84 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 769
2018-04-07HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed (92-44)
2018-04-07HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
2018-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {919831/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-03-22SenateHearing 3/22 at 9:00 a.m.
2018-03-09SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed (90-48)
2018-03-07HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-07HouseFloor Amendment {893829/1 (Delegate Fisher) Rejected (50-83)
2018-03-06HouseSpecial Order until 3/7 (Delegate W. Miller) Adopted
2018-03-06HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-05HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2018-02-22HouseHearing 2/22 at 3:00 p.m.
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0993&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0993f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0993t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0993e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_769_hb0993e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0003/hb0993_89382901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0003/hb0993_91983101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0003/hb0993.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0993_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0228.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0294.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0993_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1361.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1220.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback