MD HB991 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the circumstances under which certain indemnity and defense liability contract or agreement language concerning the provision of certain construction-related services is void and unenforceable; etc.
Title
Courts - Prohibited Indemnity and Defense Liability Agreements
Sponsors
Del. Neil Parrott [R] | Del. Nino Mangione [R] | Sen. Johnny Mautz [R] | Del. Susan McComas [R] |
Del. Sid Saab [R] | Del. Haven Shoemaker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn |
2019-03-01 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-25 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 11:30 a.m. |
2019-02-25 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-08 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |