MD HB990 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 781
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 781
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to mail a certain notice about the homestead tax credit to each individual who acquires residential real property within a reasonable period of time after the individual acquires the property by recorded deed and indicates in a certain manner that the property will be the individual's principal residence; specifying the contents of the notice; and requiring the Department to ensure that the information it provides is accurate and up-to-date.
Title
Homestead Property Tax Credit - Notification on Acquisition of Property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 781 |
2018-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {365768/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |