MD HB990 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 729
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 729
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the recovery of actual damages, expenses, litigation costs, and interest in first-party claims against disability insurers in specified civil actions that allege that the insurer failed to act in good faith under specified circumstances; requiring the Maryland Insurance Administration to include in a specified annual report to the General Assembly specified information on specified complaints regarding first-party insurance claims under individual disability insurance policies; etc.
Title
Civil Actions - Liability of Disability Insurer - Failure to Act in Good Faith
Sponsors
Del. Dan Morhaim [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-6) (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (115-18) (Y: 115 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (115-18) (Y: 115 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-28 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 729 |
2016-04-11 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (40-6) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Motion to place bill on Second Reading (Senator Zirkin) Adopted |
2016-04-11 | Senate | No recommendation by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance |
2016-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (115-18) |
2016-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {562015/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2016-02-25 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Attorneys' Fees
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Claims
Clerks of Court
Court Costs
Damages
Disabilities
Evidence
Hearings
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Jurisdiction
Liability
Records
Reports
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Claims
Clerks of Court
Court Costs
Damages
Disabilities
Evidence
Hearings
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Jurisdiction
Liability
Records
Reports