MD HB990 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a credit union, subject to the approval of the Commissioner of Financial Regulation, to conduct a savings promotion raffle under specified conditions; authorizing a depository institution to conduct a savings promotion raffle for the exclusive benefit of eligible customers; exempting specified savings promotion raffles from specified provisions of law relating to the award of prizes by chance; authorizing the Commissioner of Financial Regulation to take specified actions relating to a savings promotion raffle; etc.
Title
Financial Institutions - Credit Unions and Depository Institutions - Authority
Sponsors
Del. Jon Cardin [D] | Del. Steven DeBoy [D] | Del. William Frick [D] | Del. John Olszewski [D] |
Del. Tanya Shewell [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-04-07 | Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-05 | Senators Klausmeier, Della, and Kittleman | |
2010-04-05 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-05 | Senate Refuses to Recede | |
2010-04-02 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) | |
2010-04-01 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2010-03-30 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-26 | First Reading Finance | |
2010-04-07 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (134-2) | |
2010-04-05 | Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-03-31 | Delegates Feldman, Miller, and Vaughn | |
2010-03-31 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-03-31 | House Requests Senate Recede | |
2010-03-31 | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2010-03-23 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2010-03-22 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-02-12 | Hearing 3/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-12 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Banks and Trust Companies
Credit Unions
Federal Government
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Legislative Services, Department of
Notices
Raffles
Savings and Loan Associations
Credit Unions
Federal Government
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Legislative Services, Department of
Notices
Raffles
Savings and Loan Associations