MD HB99 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 52
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring, rather than authorizing, the Injured Workers' Insurance Fund to be the third-party administrator for the State's Self-Insured Workers' Compensation Program for State Employees under a contract with the State; authorizing the Fund to use nonsupervisory employees of the Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company; authorizing nonsupervisory employees of the Company to be assigned to perform certain functions under a certain contract; altering the membership of the Board for the Injured Workers' Insurance Fund; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor and Employment - Injured Workers' Insurance Fund - Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 52
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2020-03-15SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2020-03-12HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-12HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2020-02-04HouseHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-13HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB616 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 53

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor and Employment10101(n/a)See Bill Text
Labor and Employment10102(n/a)See Bill Text
Labor and Employment10105(n/a)See Bill Text
Labor and Employment10106(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback