MD HB99 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 435
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing certain provisions of law relating to a surviving spouse making an election to take a certain share of the net estate of the decedent, instead of that designated under the will, to ensure the surviving spouse is reasonably provided for during the surviving spouse's lifetime; providing that a surviving spouse may take a certain elective share amount of a certain estate subject to election; establishing the priority to be used in determining the sources from which a certain elective share amount is payable; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 435
2019-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2019-04-08HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {758573/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-25SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-22HouseThird Reading Passed (141-0)
2019-02-20HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-20HouseFavorable with Amendments {786182/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-01-23HouseHearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
2019-01-18HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0099&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0099f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0099t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0099e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_435_hb0099e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0099_78618201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0099_75857301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0009/hb0099.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0099_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0142.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0099_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1276.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1531.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback