MD HB99 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from importing, selling, or offering for sale specified child care products containing flame-retardant chemicals (TCEP); providing that the Act does not apply to the sale or distribution of a child care product that is resold, offered for resale, or distributed by a consumer for consumer use; specifying penalties; authorizing the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to suspend implementation under specified circumstances; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to adopt regulations; etc.
Title
Public Health - Child Care Products Containing Flame-Retardant Chemicals (TCEP) - Prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 349 |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2013-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2013-02-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {296184/1 Report Adopted |
2013-02-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2013-01-22 | House | Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-15 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Consumer Protection
Courts
Environment
Fire Protection
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Toys
Courts
Environment
Fire Protection
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Toys