MD HB99 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the operator of a specified semipermanent food service facility to meet specified requirements regarding wastewater disposal and access to a potable water supply; defining "semipermanent food service facility"; etc.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Semipermanent Food Service Facilities - Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-30 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) | |
2012-03-27 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable with Amendments 407374/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2012-03-19 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-08 | First Reading Finance | |
2012-04-01 | Passed Enrolled | |
2012-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2012-04-01 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2012-03-07 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | |
2012-02-29 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-29 | Favorable with Amendments 846687/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-02-28 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2012-01-25 | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-19 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Equipment
Food
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Records
Refuse Disposal
Restaurants
Rules and Regulations
Sewage
Water
Equipment
Food
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Records
Refuse Disposal
Restaurants
Rules and Regulations
Sewage
Water