MD HB987 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an applicant for a direct wine shipper's permit or a direct wine shipper who seeks to renew a permit to identify the wines manufactured by the applicant or direct wine shipper intended for shipment into the State.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Direct Wine Shipper's Permit - Application and Renewal Requirements
Sponsors
Del. Warren Miller [R] | Del. Steven Arentz [R] | Sen. Benjamin Brooks [D] | Del. Ned Carey [D] |
Del. Seth Howard [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 468 |
2017-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (141-0) |
2017-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {633490/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2017-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Industry and Technology
Interstate Affairs
Licenses
Postal Service
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Industry and Technology
Interstate Affairs
Licenses
Postal Service