MD HB986 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a sterile compounding facility to hold a sterile compounding permit issued by the State Board of Pharmacy before the sterile compounding facility may perform sterile compounding in the State; providing that a sterile compounding permit is required in addition to and does not replace other permits or licenses; providing that a person that prepares and distributes sterile drug products into or within the State is not required to hold a sterile compounding permit but must hold specified other permits; etc.
Title
State Board of Pharmacy - Sterile Compounding - Permits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397 |
2013-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-04-04 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2013-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2013-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {386888/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2013-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Appeals
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Discipline
Drugs
Electronic Government
Environmental Health
Equipment
Fees
Fines
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Inspections
Interstate Affairs
Licenses
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Public Information
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Discipline
Drugs
Electronic Government
Environmental Health
Equipment
Fees
Fines
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Inspections
Interstate Affairs
Licenses
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Public Information
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations