MD HB982 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from requiring an insurer or insurance producer to prepare or issue, or a policyholder to provide, a certificate of insurance that contains false or misleading information relating to the policy of insurance referenced in the certificate; etc.
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Certificates of Insurance and Certificate of
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-04-05 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2011-03-24 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-23 | First Reading Finance | |
2011-04-07 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-20 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2011-03-18 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-18 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-18 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-02-14 | Hearing 3/2 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-11 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Disclosure
Forms
Insurance
Insurance Administration
Investigations and Inquiries
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Disclosure
Forms
Insurance
Insurance Administration
Investigations and Inquiries
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
Rules and Regulations