MD HB980 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Hearing: Mar 28 @ 1:00 pm Senate Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing a prohibition against the consideration of zoning issues by the Board of License Commissioners of Baltimore City when hearing and determining a protest filed against a renewal of an alcoholic beverages license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Protest of License Renewal - Zoning Violations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-15HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-13HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2019-02-08HouseHearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback