MD HB98 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from intentionally selling or using specified software to circumvent a security measure, an access control system, or any other control or measure on a specified Web site that is used to ensure an equitable ticket buying process; and providing that a violation of the Act is an unfair or deceptive trade practice under the Maryland Consumer Protection Act and is subject to specified enforcement and penalty provisions.
Title
Commercial Law - Interference With Internet Ticket Sales - Prohibition
Sponsors
Del. Sam Arora [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-03-26 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2014-02-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2014-02-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-02-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-02-04 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2014-01-29 | House | Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2013-10-22 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Electronic Commerce
Motion Pictures
Safety
Sports and Recreation
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Unfair Trade Practices
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Electronic Commerce
Motion Pictures
Safety
Sports and Recreation
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Unfair Trade Practices